Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
14.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
07.05.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.03.2024 | Change - representative | |
08.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.02.2024 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
03.03.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.03.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
26.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |