EP4391934 - DEVICES TO BE ACTUATED WITHIN THE UTERUS TO PROVIDE SUCTION FOR TREATING UTERINE BLEEDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STRYKER CORPORATION 2825 Airview Boulevard Kalamazoo, MI 49002 / US | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACLACHLAN, Brian Norton Shores, Michigan 49444 / US | 02 /
ESSER, Robert L. Rockford, Michigan 49341 / US | 03 /
FRANK, Laura Greer, South Carolina 29650 / US | 04 /
LAFLECHE, Patrick Kalamazoo, Michigan 49009 / US | 05 /
NORLAND, Leif Joseph, Michigan 49085 / US | 06 /
WADE, Lucas Austin, Texas 78757 / US | 07 /
WEST, Lauren R. Cedar Park, Texas 78613 / US | 08 /
BERNERO, John P. Round Rock, Texas 78681 / US | 09 /
SEPULVEDA, Christy Austin, Texas 78727 / US | 10 /
VANSICKLE, Spencer Gage Plainwell, Michigan 49080 / US | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22772731.0 | 26.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022US41636 | Priority number, date | US202163237611P | 27.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163237611 P | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023028291 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391934 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/42, A61M1/00, A61B17/12, A61B90/00 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61B17/42 (EP);
A61M1/76 (EP);
A61M1/87 (EP);
A61B17/1204 (EP);
A61B17/12099 (EP);
A61B17/12136 (EP);
A61B2017/4216 (EP);
A61B2090/0807 (EP);
A61M1/79 (EP);
A61M2210/1433 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR BETÄTIGUNG IM UTERUS ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON ABSAUGUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON UTERUSBLUTUNGEN | [2024/27] | English: | DEVICES TO BE ACTUATED WITHIN THE UTERUS TO PROVIDE SUCTION FOR TREATING UTERINE BLEEDING | [2024/27] | French: | DISPOSITIFS À ACTIONNER À L'INTÉRIEUR DE L'UTÉRUS POUR FOURNIR UNE ASPIRATION POUR TRAITER UN SAIGNEMENT UTÉRIN | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 07.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2011060191 (MINERVA SURGICAL INC [US], et al); | [XA]US2013165744 (CARSON SANDRA ANN [US], et al); | [XAY]US2014216467 (KOCHEM THOMAS C [US], et al) | by applicant | US2005171495 | WO2007070570 | WO2014066337 | WO2017112684 |