Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4370585
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
19.09.2024 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
19.09.2024 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
22.08.2024 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.08.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.04.2024 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
19.04.2024 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
28.03.2024 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.02.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
20.02.2024 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.02.2024 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2024 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
12.02.2024 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2023 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2023 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
28.09.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|