EP4370585 - CITRONELLOL ALKOXYLATE SURFACTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states P2 Science, Inc. 4 Research Drive Woodbridge, CT 06525 / US | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOLEY, Patrick Woodbridge, Connecticut 06525 / US | 02 /
ANASTASIOU, Ted Woodbridge, Connecticut 06525 / US | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | Synergy IP Group AG Leonhardsgraben 52 Postfach 4001 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2024/21] | Pharma Patents International AG Leonhardsgraben 52 Postfach 4001 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 22773358.1 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022US73805 | Priority number, date | US202163222170P | 15.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163222170 P | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023288322 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4370585 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/00, C08G65/26, C08G65/332, C08G65/333, C08G65/334, C08G65/337, C08G65/34, A61K8/00 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
C08G65/34 (EP);
C09K23/44 (US);
A61K8/86 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
C07C235/08 (US);
C08G65/002 (EP);
C08G65/2609 (EP);
C08G65/3322 (EP);
C08G65/33306 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Title | German: | CITRONELLOLALKOXYLATTENSIDE | [2024/21] | English: | CITRONELLOL ALKOXYLATE SURFACTANTS | [2024/21] | French: | TENSIOACTIFS D'ALCOXYLATE DE CITRONELLOL | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 15.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1203589 (BASF AG [DE]); | [X]DE102005025739 (CLARIANT PRODUKTE DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [AD]US2017283553 (FOLEY PATRICK [US], et al); | [A]WO2019173614 (P2 SCIENCE INC [US]); | [A]US10844169 (FOLEY PATRICK [US], et al) | by applicant | US2017283553 | US2020165383 | US2020392287 | WO2021133994 | WO2021146461 | WO2021146448 | US2021230364 | WO2021178217 |