Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
05.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] |
06.12.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2023 | Change - representative | |
23.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.09.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.09.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |