Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024157794 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 | WO2022JP06656 | 18.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230161949 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 | WO2022JP06656 | 18.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117098453 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 | WO2022JP06656 | 18.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4316227 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 | WO2022JP06656 | 18.02.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022202013 | Global Dossier | 29.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2022151692 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2021054414 | 26.03.2021 |