EP4316227 - DISPLAY DEVICE FOR TRACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 530-0013 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, So Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8515 / JP | 02 /
MIWA, Toshiyuki Okayama-shi, Okayama 702-8515 / JP | 03 /
KAWAI, Susumu Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0013 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22774813.4 | 18.02.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP06656 | Priority number, date | JP20210054414 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021054414 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022202013 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4316227 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
B60K35/22 (EP,KR,US);
A01B63/00 (KR);
A01B76/00 (EP,US);
B60K35/28 (EP);
B60K2360/162 (EP);
B60K2360/171 (EP);
B60Y2200/221 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG FÜR TRAKTOR | [2024/06] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE FOR TRACTOR | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE POUR TRACTEUR | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2023 | Translation filed | 23.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2006149301 (MITSUBISHI AGRICULT MACH); | [Y]JP2011142884 (MATSUYAMA KK); | [YX]JP2020074750 (MATSUYAMA KK) | by applicant | JP2011142884 | JP2020074750 |