EP4301043 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zhiheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Feng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
LONG, Yi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
GAO, Xiang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 05 /
GAN, Jiansong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Ye Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22783939.6 | 31.03.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022CN84337 | Priority number, date | CN202110364486 | 05.04.2021 Original published format: CN202110364486 | CN202110894503 | 05.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110894503 | [2024/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022213872 | Date: | 13.10.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301043 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 13.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/00, H04W72/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
H04W72/51 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (CN,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0023 (EP);
H04L5/0048 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/0058 (EP);
H04L5/006 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W8/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2024/01] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2023 | Translation filed | 29.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN112514432 (QUALCOMM INC) [A] 1-46 * entire document *; | [X] - CHINA TELECOM, "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #100bis R1-2002190", Remaining issues on uplink Tx switching, (20200430), XP051873476 [X] 1-46 * section 2, paragraph 2, and section 3 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; NR; User Equipment (UE) radio access capabilities (Release 16)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Specification; 3GPP TS 38.306, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), (20210106), vol. RAN WG2, no. V16.3.0, pages 1 - 135, XP051999695 [A] 1-46 * section 4.2 * | [A] - ZTE Corporation, "RAN1 impact on switch between case1 and case2 for two uplink carriers", 3GPP Draft; R1-1911977, Reno, USA, (20191109), vol. RAN WG1, pages 1 - 5, XP051823158 [A] 1-46 * entire document * | [A] - QUALCOMM INC., "3GPP TSG RAN WG1 #100bis R1-202516", Discussion on 1Tx-2Tx switching impact in RAN1, (20200430), XP051875630 [A] 1-46 * entire document * |