EP4405573 - METHOD FOR POSITIVE CRANKSHAFT VENTILATION DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | 27.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies IP Limited The Grove 21 Pine Road Belleville St Michael BB 11113 / BB | [2024/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL HOR, Noureddine 41350 VINEUIL / FR | 02 /
DECORPS, Davy 45160 OLIVET / FR | [2024/31] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2024/31] | Application number, filing date | 22790487.7 | 19.09.2022 | [2024/31] | WO2022EP75892 | Priority number, date | GB20210013392 | 20.09.2021 Original published format: GB 202113392 | [2024/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023041760 | Date: | 23.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4405573 | Date: | 31.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01M11/10, F01M13/00, F02D41/22 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
F01M13/00 (EP);
F02D41/22 (EP,GB);
F01M11/10 (EP,US);
F01M13/022 (GB);
F02M35/10222 (GB);
F01M2013/0083 (EP);
F01M2250/60 (EP,US);
F02D2041/1432 (EP);
F02D2250/08 (EP,GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR POSITIVEN KURBELWELLENENTLÜFTUNGSDIAGNOSE | [2024/31] | English: | METHOD FOR POSITIVE CRANKSHAFT VENTILATION DIAGNOSIS | [2024/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC DE RÉCUPÉRATION DES GAZ DE CARTER MOTEUR | [2024/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/31] | 05.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010147270 (PURSIFULL ROSS DYKSTRA [US], et al); | [I]US2016097355 (JENTZ ROBERT ROY [US], et al); | [I]WO2020152238 (VITESCO TECH GMBH [DE]); | [I]US2020400050 (JENTZ ROBERT ROY [US], et al); | [IP]US2021348532 (HOLZEDER ANDREAS [DE], et al) |