EP4329339 - USER EQUIPMENT AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-city Aichi 448-8661 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Tomoyuki Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideaki Kariya-city, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22791635.0 | 11.04.2022 | [2024/09] | WO2022JP17501 | Priority number, date | JP20210070613 | 19.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021070613 | [2024/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022224861 | Date: | 27.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329339 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04W68/12, H04W88/06 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP);
H04W60/00 (US);
H04W60/005 (EP);
H04W68/005 (EP,US);
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04W88/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/09] | English: | USER EQUIPMENT AND COMMUNICATION CONTROL METHOD | [2024/09] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT UTILISATEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION | [2024/09] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2023 | Translation filed | 04.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 12.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |