EP4329891 - SEQUENTIAL ELECTROPORATION METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxcyte, Inc. 9713 Key West Ave. Suite 400 Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACHARYA, Diwash Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 02 /
BRADY, James Rockville, MD 20850 / US | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22796966.4 | 27.04.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022US71958 | Priority number, date | US202163181583P | 29.04.2021 Original published format: US 202163181583 P | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022232802 | Date: | 03.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329891 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/00, C12N15/86, A61P35/02, C12N15/63, C12N9/22 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C12N15/87 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C12N13/00 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,IL);
C12M35/02 (IL,KR,US);
C12N15/102 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Title | German: | SEQUENTIELLE ELEKTROPORATIONSVERFAHREN | [2024/10] | English: | SEQUENTIAL ELECTROPORATION METHODS | [2024/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'ÉLECTROPORATION SÉQUENTIELLE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 04.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6746441 (HOFMANN GUNTER A [US], et al); | [X]US2020208174 (CABANIOLS JEAN-PIERRE [FR], et al) |