Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
12.04.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - classification | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
19.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
20.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.06.2023 | Change - representative | |
13.06.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.03.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
16.12.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
16.12.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |