EP4353484 - PRINTER, PRINTING METHOD FOR PRINTER, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sato Holdings Kabushiki Kaisha 3-1-1 Shibaura Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAFUJI, Takuma Tokyo 108-0023 / JP | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22820060.6 | 26.05.2022 | [2024/16] | WO2022JP21559 | Priority number, date | JP20210095021 | 07.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021095021 | [2024/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022259878 | Date: | 15.12.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4353484 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/36, B41J2/32, B41J2/355, B41J2/365, B41J2/37 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B41J2/355 (EP);
B41J2/37 (EP,US);
B41J2/04541 (US);
B41J2/32 (EP);
B41J2/36 (EP);
B41J2/365 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2024/16] | B41J2/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Title | German: | DRUCKER, DRUCKVERFAHREN FÜR EINEN DRUCKER UND PROGRAMM | [2024/16] | English: | PRINTER, PRINTING METHOD FOR PRINTER, AND PROGRAM | [2024/16] | French: | IMPRIMANTE, PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION POUR IMPRIMANTE ET PROGRAMME | [2024/16] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2023 | Translation filed | 13.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH08281993 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0018]-[0048] *; | [A]US2006176358 (MULHEARN CHRIS [US], et al) [A] 1-8* entire text *; | [A]JP2009113445 (SEIKO INSTR INC) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0016]-[0045] *; | [YX]JP2010228259 (NEC PERSONAL PRODUCTS CO LTD) [Y] 6 [X] 1-5, 7-8; | [Y]JP2012076352 (BROTHER IND LTD) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0023]-[0046] *; | [A]JP2014168903 (TOSHIBA TEC KK) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0023]-[0054] *; | [A]JP2018047642 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0034]-[0077] * | by applicant | JP2010228259 | JP2021095021 |