EP4379073 - HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON STEEL CORPORATION 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYODA, Takeshi Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | 02 /
SHUTO, Hiroshi Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22848959.7 | 12.04.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022JP17623 | Priority number, date | JP20210122173 | 27.07.2021 Original published format: JP 2021122173 | [2024/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023007876 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | JA | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4379073 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/58 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/58 (KR);
C21D6/005 (EP);
C21D8/02 (EP);
C21D8/0226 (EP,KR);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP,KR);
C22C38/001 (KR);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/008 (EP,KR);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/08 (EP);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/32 (EP);
C22C38/34 (EP);
C22C38/38 (EP);
C22C38/42 (KR);
C22C38/44 (KR);
C22C38/46 (KR);
C22C38/48 (KR);
C22C38/50 (KR);
C22C38/54 (KR);
C21D2211/002 (KR);
C21D2211/005 (KR);
C21D2211/008 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WARMGEWALZTES STAHLBLECH | [2024/23] | English: | HOT-ROLLED STEEL SHEET | [2024/23] | French: | TÔLE D'ACIER LAMINÉE À CHAUD | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2023 | Translation filed | 22.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2009019265 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]WO2015162932 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2016010005 (NIPPON STEEL & SUMITOMO METAL CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2020058747 (ARCELORMITTAL [LU]); | [A]WO2020195605 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2001040450 | JP2001172745 | JP2009019265 | WO2016010005 | JP2021122173 |