EP4380249 - POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Yiran Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
SHAO, Jiafeng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
YU, Jian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ZHAO, Wenqi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22855549.6 | 12.08.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022CN112322 | Priority number, date | CN202110932074 | 13.08.2021 Original published format: CN202110932074 | [2024/23] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023016569 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | ZH | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4380249 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
H04W52/24 (EP);
H04W52/242 (EP,US);
H04W52/14 (EP);
H04W52/146 (EP);
H04W52/246 (US);
H04W52/283 (EP);
H04W52/367 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG | [2024/23] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2024 | Translation filed | 26.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Search fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |