Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] |
23.04.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.02.2024 | Change - representative | |
26.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.02.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.02.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |