Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024259955 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN112322 | 12.08.2022 | CN202110932074 | 13.08.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4380249 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN112322 | 12.08.2022 | CN202110932074 | 13.08.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023016569 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110932074 | 13.08.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115707076 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110932074 | 13.08.2021 |