EP4332949 - DISPLAY MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.01.2024 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nanjing Lopu Co Ltd N°. 1, Xinke 3rd Road Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210061 / CN | For all designated states Nanjing Lopu Technology Co., Ltd. Building D-04 No. 1 Gaoke 1st Road Jiangbei New Area Nanjing, Jiangsu 210061 / CN | [2024/12] |
Former [2024/10] | For all designated states Nanjing Lopu Co Ltd N°. 1, Xinke 3rd Road Jiangbei New District Nanjing, Jiangsu 210061 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Bin Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Deyu Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 03 /
LI, Sheng Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 04 /
XU, Ning Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 05 /
LV, Xiuwei Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 06 /
GUO, Chengbing Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 07 /
JIANG, Lingling Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | 08 /
XU, Yezhuang Nanjing Jiangsu 210061 / CN | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2024/10] | Application number, filing date | 22868456.9 | 29.11.2022 | [2024/10] | WO2022CN134989 | Priority number, date | CN202221833351U | 18.07.2022 Original published format: CN 202221833351 U | [2024/10] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2024016545 | Date: | 25.01.2024 | Language: | ZH | [2024/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332949 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.01.2024 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G09F9/33, G09F9/302, H05K7/20 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
G09F9/3026 (EP,KR);
H04N5/642 (US);
G09F9/33 (EP,KR);
G09G3/32 (US);
H01L25/0753 (KR);
H01L27/156 (KR);
G09G2300/026 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEMODUL UND ANZEIGEBILDSCHIRM | [2024/10] | English: | DISPLAY MODULE AND DISPLAY SCREEN | [2024/10] | French: | MODULE D'AFFICHAGE ET ÉCRAN D'AFFICHAGE | [2024/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2023 | Translation filed | 24.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 04.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |