Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
20.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] |
12.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
12.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
17.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.11.2023 | Change - representative | |
08.11.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.05.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor |