Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4320749 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2024 | A4 | EP4320749 | 14.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022KR16487 | 26.10.2022 | US202218047963 | 19.10.2022 | US202163273786 | 29.10.2021 | US202263337496 | 02.05.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023075417 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202218047963 | 19.10.2022 | US202163273786 | 29.10.2021 | US202263337496 | 02.05.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023136372 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202218047963 | 19.10.2022 | US202163273786 | 29.10.2021 | US202263337496 | 02.05.2022 |