EP4320749 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TIME-DELAY BASED HYBRID BEAMFORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATNAM, Vishnu Vardhan Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
ABU-SURRA, Shadi Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
MO, Jianhua Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 04 /
XU, Gang Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 05 /
YUAN, Jin Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 06 /
ALAMMOURI, Ahmad Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 07 /
NG, Boon Loong Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 08 /
ZHANG, Jianzhong Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2024/07] | Application number, filing date | 22887613.2 | 26.10.2022 | [2024/07] | WO2022KR16487 | Priority number, date | US202163273786P | 29.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163273786 P | US202263337496P | 02.05.2022 Original published format: US 202263337496 P | US202218047963 | 19.10.2022 Original published format: US202218047963 | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023075417 | Date: | 04.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4320749 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.05.2023 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/06, H04B7/0408 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
H04B7/0617 (EP);
H04B7/0667 (EP,US);
H04B7/01 (US);
H04B7/0408 (US);
H04B7/0695 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZEITVERZÖGERUNGSBASIERTEN HYBRIDEN STRAHLFORMUNG | [2024/07] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR TIME-DELAY BASED HYBRID BEAMFORMING | [2024/07] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE FAISCEAU HYBRIDE À BASE DE RETARD TEMPOREL | [2024/07] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019081693 (EITAN ALECSANDER [IL], et al); | [XI]US2020174114 (ROEMER CHRISTIAN [DE]); | International search | [A]US2014241463 (LEENAERTS DOMINICUS MARTINUS WILHELMUS [NL], et al); | [Y]US2020174114 (ROEMER CHRISTIAN [DE]); | [A]WO2021170204 (ARQANA TECH BV [BE]); |