Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4249028 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | A3 | EP4249028 | 27.09.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP20000150 | 14.04.2020 | DE102019110631 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020338289 | Global Dossier | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019110631 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3730174 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | B1 | EP3730174 | 28.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019110631 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111840719 | Global Dossier | 30.10.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102019110631 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102020002278 | 29.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102019110631 | 24.04.2019 | Type | Earlier application | EP3730174 |