EP4249028 - BREATHING GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Löwenstein Medical Technology S.A. 18, rue Robert Stümper 2557 Luxembourg / LU | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWAIBOLD, Matthias 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
TIEMANN, Björn 22359 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
GÖBEL, Christof 22457 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
DÖMER, Benno 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 05 /
ADAMETZ, Bemjamin 22609 Hamburg / DE | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Marx, Thomas Löwenstein Medical Technology GmbH + Co. KG IP Management Kronsaalsweg 40 22525 Hamburg / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 23020317.6 | 14.04.2020 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | DE201910110631 | 24.04.2019 Original published format: DE102019110631 | [2023/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4249028 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4249028 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00, A61M16/10, A61M16/16 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61M16/024 (EP);
A61M16/161 (CN);
A61M16/022 (US);
A61M16/0057 (US);
A61M16/0069 (EP);
A61M16/06 (US);
A61M16/0666 (US);
A61M16/1075 (EP,CN);
A61M16/16 (EP,US);
A61M2016/0015 (EP);
A61M2016/0027 (US);
A61M2016/003 (EP,CN);
A61M2202/0208 (US);
A61M2205/33 (CN);
A61M2205/3327 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/39] | A61M16/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2023/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ATEMGASVERSORGUNG | [2023/39] | English: | BREATHING GAS SUPPLY SYSTEM | [2023/39] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ RESPIRATOIRE | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 30.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/39] | 13.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20000150.1 / EP3730174 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6213119 (BRYDON JOHN WILLIAM ERNEST [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 2 - column 6, line 9 *; | [A]US2003154977 (WHITE CRAIG KARL [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0038] - [0053] *; | [YA]US2006065270 (LI KUN [US]) [Y] 1-5,8,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0057] * [A] 6,7,9-11,13; | [A]US2011120462 (TATKOV STANISLAV [NZ], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [YA]WO2013163685 (RESMED LTD [AU]) [Y] 1-5,8,12,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0086] - [0161] * [A] 6,7,9-11,13 |