EP4328266 - POLYETHYLENE POWDER AND MOLDED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2023 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.02.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIKATA, Kazuya Tokyo, 1000006 / JP | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 23162468.5 | 16.03.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | JP20220042424 | 17.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022042424 | [2024/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328266 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
C08L23/06 (EP);
C08F110/02 (US);
C08L2205/06 (EP);
C08L2207/068 (EP);
C08L2666/00 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L91/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYETHYLENPULVER UND FORMKÖRPER | [2024/09] | English: | POLYETHYLENE POWDER AND MOLDED ARTICLE | [2024/09] | French: | POUDRE DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/09] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US10041191 (TARUTANI ATSUYOSHI [JP]); | [A]WO2021193544 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) | by applicant | DE3127133 | JP2006273977 | JP4868853B | JP5767202B | JP6686092B | WO2020230809 | WO2021193422 | WO2021210590 |