Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023322980 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2022042424 | 17.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7496443B | Global Dossier | 06.06.2024 | B2 | JP2023138348 | 02.10.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2022042424 | 17.03.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4328266 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2022042424 | 17.03.2022 |