Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
13.10.2023 | Publication of search report | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
13.10.2023 | Change - classification | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
21.07.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
21.07.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
04.04.2023 | Change - representative | |
04.04.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |