Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2024129852 | Global Dossier | 18.04.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | US202117267134 | 09.02.2021 | US202318490832 | 20.10.2023 | WO2019CN85160 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11825294 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2023 | B2 | US2021314862 | 07.10.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | WO2019CN85160 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3817436 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2023 | B1 | EP3817436 | 15.09.2021 | A4 | EP3817436 | 05.05.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | WO2019CN85160 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115515164 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | CN202210955096 | 10.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115515163 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | CN202210954755 | 10.08.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4231724 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2023 | A3 | EP4231724 | 23.08.2023 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | EP19847833 | 30.04.2019 | WO2019CN85160 | 30.04.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020029615 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110831027B | Global Dossier | 19.08.2022 | B | CN110831027 | 21.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 | Type | Earlier application | EP3817436 |