EP4231724 - METHOD FOR MONITORING PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Haibo Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Jian Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Haitao Shenzhen, 518129 / CN | [2023/34] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/34] | Application number, filing date | 23166448.3 | 30.04.2019 | [2023/34] | Priority number, date | CN201810912060 | 10.08.2018 Original published format: CN201810912060 | [2023/34] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4231724 | Date: | 23.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4231724 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W52/02, // H04W76/28 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
H04W76/28 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/02 (CN);
H04W52/0216 (US);
H04W28/0278 (US);
H04W52/0229 (US);
H04W52/0248 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | H04W52/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES PHYSIKALISCHEN DOWNLINK-STEUERUNGSKANALS UND KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/34] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING PHYSICAL DOWNLINK CONTROL CHANNEL AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2023/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN CANAL PHYSIQUE DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2023/34] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/34] | 23.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19847833.1 / EP3817436 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2010135159 (CHUN SUNG DUCK [KR], et al) [I] 1-3,9,10,14,15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0081] * [A] 4-8,11-13; | [IA] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Design considerations for UE power saving", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1807306, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20180520), XP051442501 [I] 1,2,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 3-13 | [A] - VIVO, "Views on Rel-16 NR UE power saving", vol. TSG RAN, no. La Jolla, USA; 20180611 - 20180614, (20180604), 3GPP DRAFT; RP-180810_VIEWS ON REL-16 NR UE POWER SAVING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/TSG%5FRAN/TSGR%5F80/Docs/RP%2D180810%2Ezip, (20180604), XP051510691 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Remaining issues on DRX timers", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, Nevada, USA; 20171127 - 20171201, (20171117), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1713471 - REMAINING ISSUES ON DRX TIMERS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/WG2%5FRL2/TSGR2%5F100/Docs/, (20171117), XP051372179 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - NOKIA ET AL, "MAC CE details for dormant SCell state", vol. RAN WG2, no. Busan, South Korea; 20180521 - 20180525, (20180520), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1806775 DORMANT MAC CE DETAILS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/, (20180520), XP051443235 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA); Medium Access Control (MAC) protocol specification (Release 14)", (20180706), 3GPP DRAFT; 36321-E70, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/3guInternal/3GPP%5Fultimate%5Fversions%5Fto%5Fbe%5Ftransposed/sentToDpc, (20180706), XP051454319 [A] 1-15 * section 1 * * section 5.7 * |