EP4218922 - METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH WIRELESS POWER RECEPTION AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.02.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.06.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jaechun 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 02 /
Bae, Chisung 16678 Suwon-si / KR | 03 /
Kim, Sang Joon 16678 Suwon-si / KR | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 23173124.1 | 30.11.2021 | [2023/31] | Priority number, date | KR20210041908 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210041908 | [2023/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4218922 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4218922 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/378, A61N1/372 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
A61N1/3787 (EP,CN,US);
H02J50/27 (KR);
H02J50/10 (CN);
H02J50/12 (CN,US);
A61B5/6846 (CN);
A61N1/37205 (CN);
A61N1/37217 (CN);
A61N1/37223 (CN);
A61N1/37229 (EP);
H01F38/14 (KR);
H01Q9/285 (KR);
H01Q9/40 (KR);
H02J50/20 (CN);
H02J50/40 (CN);
H02J50/80 (KR);
H04B5/22 (CN);
H04B5/24 (CN);
H04B5/79 (KR,US);
A61B2562/02 (CN);
A61B2562/16 (CN);
A61B5/6868 (US);
H02J2310/23 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] |
Former [2023/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG MIT DRAHTLOSEM STROMEMPFANG UND DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/31] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS WITH WIRELESS POWER RECEPTION AND WIRELESS COMMUNICATION | [2023/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE RÉCEPTION D'ÉNERGIE SANS FIL ET COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/10] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21211325.2 / EP4066886 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014094674 (NURMIKKO ARTO V [US], et al); | [A]US2018140852 (LINDER WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [A]US10238872 (PIVONKA DANIEL [US], et al); | [A]US2021012945 (RIDLER OLIVER JOHN [AU], et al); | [A]WO2021009646 (COCHLEAR LTD [AU]) |