Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] |
16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] |
07.08.2023 | Change - representative |