EP4328967 - SIC-BASED ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH FUSE ELEMENT FOR SHORTCIRCTUITS PROTECTION, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 30.08.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCALIA, Laura Letizia 95037 SAN GIOVANNI LA PUNTA (CT) / IT | 02 /
CAMALLERI, Cateno Marco 95125 CATANIA / IT | 03 /
ZANETTI, Edoardo 95028 VALVERDE (CT) / IT | 04 /
RUSSO, Alfio 95033 BIANCAVILLA (CT) / IT | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 23190203.2 | 08.08.2023 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | IT20220017676 | 26.08.2022 Original published format: IT202200017676 | [2024/09] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4328967 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/525, H01L29/78, H01L23/62 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H01L23/5256 (EP,US);
H01L23/62 (CN);
H01L21/76895 (CN);
H01L23/293 (US);
H01L29/1608 (EP,US);
H01L29/4238 (EP);
H01L29/66068 (CN);
H01L29/66666 (US);
H01L29/7802 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/40] |
Former [2024/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIC-BASIERTE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT SICHERUNGSELEMENT FÜR KURZSCHLUSSSCHUTZ UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2024/09] | English: | SIC-BASED ELECTRONIC DEVICE WITH FUSE ELEMENT FOR SHORTCIRCTUITS PROTECTION, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2024/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE À BASE DE SIC AVEC ÉLÉMENT FUSIBLE POUR LA PROTECTION CONTRE LES COURTS-CIRCUITS ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/40] | 26.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5833865 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]US6252292 (BRINTZINGER AXEL C [US], et al); | [A]US2007210890 (HSU LOUIS L [US], et al); | [A]US2013214894 (BONILLA GRISELDA [US], et al); | [A]US2019304907 (CHAO YU-LIN [US], et al) |