EP0002842 - Propanthioic acid derivatives, herbicidal and/or plant growth regulating compositions comprising these derivatives and method of destroying or preventing undesirable plant growth [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Entwistle, Ian David 44 Woodside Gardens Sittingbourne Kent / GB | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Rogers, Roy Charles, et al 4 York Road London SE1 7NA / GB | [1982/22] |
Former [1982/22] | Keuzenkamp, Abraham P.O. Box 302 NL-2501 CH 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 78200228.1 | 06.10.1978 | Priority number, date | US19770842772 | 17.10.1977 Original published format: US 842772 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0002842 | Date: | 11.07.1979 | Language: | EN | [N/P] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0002842 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1979 | Classification | IPC: | C07C153/05, A01N37/48 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
A01N37/52 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/22] | C07C153/05, A01N9/12 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, NL | Title | German: | Thiopropionsäurederivate, sie enthaltende herbizide und/oder pflanzenwachstumsregulierende Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Kontrolle von unerwünschtem Pflanzenwachstum | English: | Propanthioic acid derivatives, herbicidal and/or plant growth regulating compositions comprising these derivatives and method of destroying or preventing undesirable plant growth | French: | Dérivés de l'acide thiopropionique, compositions herbicides et/ou régulatrices de la croissance des plantes les contenant et méthodes pour contrôler la croissance des plantes indésirables | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 10.12.1979 | Examination requested [1980/04] | 26.01.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.03.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.11.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1980 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1421215 [ ] (SHELL RES LTD); | GB1039459 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH); | DE2008601 [ ]; | DE2162073 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH) |