EP0006530 - Fibre-optical temperature sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | [1980/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sander, Lars, Dipl.-Ing. Bernsborgstigen 6 S-722 18 Västeras / SE | [1980/01] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/01] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 79101906.0 | 12.06.1979 | [1980/01] | Priority number, date | SE19780007199 | 26.06.1978 Original published format: SE 7807199 | [1980/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0006530 | Date: | 09.01.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0006530 | Date: | 28.07.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1979 | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/12, G01K1/02 | [1980/01] | CPC: |
G01K11/12 (EP,US);
G01K1/024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/01] | Title | German: | Faseroptisches Temperaturmessgerät | [1980/01] | English: | Fibre-optical temperature sensor | [1980/01] | French: | Capteur de température à fibres optiques | [1980/01] | Examination procedure | 06.06.1980 | Examination requested [1980/17] | 23.10.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB1103059 [ ] (ROLLS ROYCE); | CH490062 [ ] (WMF WUERTTEMBERG METALLWAREN [DE]); | FR2213493 [ ] (ONERA (OFF NAT AEROSPATIALE) [FR]); | FR2319120 [ ] (KRYLOV VYACHESLAV [SU]); | US4016761 [ ] (ROZZELL THOMAS C, et al); | US4075493 [ ] (WICKERSHEIM KENNETH A); | DE2834389 [ ] (GRAVINER LTD); | FR2400193 [ ] (GRAVINER LTD [GB]) | [ ] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 20, Oktober 1977, Nr. 5, New York, K. BLOTEKJAER et al.: "Remote temperature sensor", Seite 1929. * Das ganze Dokument * |