EP0010425 - Semipermeable composite membrane and the preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/09] | For all designated states TEIJIN LIMITED 11 Minami Honmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Shigeyoshi 1-40, Yamatecho 3-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 740 / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Yuzuru 1-23, Yamatecho 3-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 740 / JP | 03 /
Kawaguchi, Takeyuki 28-5, Ozucho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 740 / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Noriaki 9-2, Yamatecho 2-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 740 / JP | 05 /
Taketani, Yutaka 10-10, Iwakuni 3-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ken, 741 / JP | 06 /
Minematsu, Hiroroshi 28-5, Ozucho 1-chome Iwakuni-shi Yamaguchi-ke, 740 / JP | [1980/09] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1980/09] | Application number, filing date | 79302224.5 | 16.10.1979 | [1980/09] | Priority number, date | JP19780127300 | 18.10.1978 Original published format: JP 12730078 | [1980/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0010425 | Date: | 30.04.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0010425 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1980 | Classification | IPC: | B01D13/04, C08J5/22 | [1980/09] | CPC: |
B01D71/60 (EP,US);
B01D69/125 (EP,US);
B01D71/441 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/09] | Title | German: | Semipermeable zusammengesetzte Membrane und deren Herstellung | [1980/09] | English: | Semipermeable composite membrane and the preparation thereof | [1980/09] | French: | Membrane semiperméable composite et sa préparation | [1980/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 13.10.1980 | Examination requested [1981/01] | 08.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.03.1982 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1982 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1982 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.1983 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3133137 [ ] (SIDNEY LOEB, et al); | US3133132 [ ] (SIDNEY LOEB, et al); | US3567630 [ ] (LUKACH CARL A); | FR2211271 [ ] (TNO [NL], et al); | CH559052 [ ] (CESKOSLOVENSKA AKADEMIE VED); | DE2457355 [ ] (RHONE POULENC SA); | US3901810 [ ] (BROOKS THOMAS WILLIAM, et al); | GB1416457 [ ] (DU PONT); | DE2342226 [ ]; | DE2615954 [ ] (KURARAY CO); | US3993625 [ ] (KURIHARA MASARU, et al); | US4086215 [ ] (KURIHARA MASARU, et al) |