EP0009049 - Apparatus and method for fabricating microminiature devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1980/07] | VARIABLE-SPOT SCANNING IN AN ELECTRON BEAM EXPOSURE SYSTEM | ||
[1982/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, NY 10038 / US | [1983/10] |
Former [1980/07] | For all designated states Western Electric Company, Incorporated 222 Broadway New York, N.Y. 10038 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLIER, Robert, Jacob 76 Whitman Drive New Providence, NJ 07974 / US | [1980/07] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, Brian Richard, et al Western Electric Company Limited 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1980/07] | Lawrence, Brian Richard, et al Western Electric Company Limited 5, Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 79900259.7 | 14.02.1979 | [1980/07] | WO1979US00086 | Priority number, date | US19780879097 | 21.02.1978 Original published format: US 879097 | [1980/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO7900645 | Date: | 06.09.1979 | [1979/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0009049 | Date: | 02.04.1980 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.1979 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1980/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0009049 | Date: | 17.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/11] | Search report(s) | Classification | IPC: | G21K5/00, H01J37/30 | [1982/11] | CPC: |
H01J37/302 (EP,US);
H01J37/3007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1980/21] | G21K5/00, G21K5/04, H01J29/46 | ||
Former IPC [1980/07] | G21K5/00, G21K5/04 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB [1980/07] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Mikrominiatur-Bauteilen | [1982/11] | English: | Apparatus and method for fabricating microminiature devices | [1982/11] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la fabrication de dispositifs microminiaturisés | [1982/11] |
Former [1980/07] | RASTERABLENKUNG MIT EINEM VARIABLEN BRENNFLECK FÜR EINE ELEKTRONENBÜNDELBESTRAHLUNGSANORDNUNG | ||
Former [1980/07] | VARIABLE-SPOT SCANNING IN AN ELECTRON BEAM EXPOSURE SYSTEM | ||
Former [1980/07] | POINT D'EXPLORATION VARIABLE DANS UN SYSTEME D'EXPOSITION A FAISCEAU ELECTRONIQUE | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 11.10.1979 | National basic fee paid | 11.10.1979 | Search fee paid | 11.10.1979 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.10.1979 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.1979 | Examination requested [1980/20] | 13.11.1980 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.06.1981 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1981 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1981 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1981 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1981 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.12.1982 | No opposition filed within time limit [ N /P ] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.1981 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3491236 (NEWBERRY STERLING P); | [X]US4117340 (GOTO EIICHI, et al); | [X]US4110622 (TROTEL JACQUES); | [A]US3413517 (RUSSELL BARBER ROBERT, et al); | [A]US3876883 (BROERS ALEC NIGEL, et al) |