EP0018520 - Elimination process of crystal defects produced in N-type layers of a silicon semiconductor device by phosphorus ion implantation and device produced by this method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.12.1984 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.02.1985 [1985/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmitt, Alfred, Dr. Schramberger Strasse 45 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | 02 /
Schorer, Gerd, Dr. Carl-Orffweg 50 D-7033 Herrenberg / DE | [1980/23] | Representative(s) | Kreidler, Eva-Maria Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/23] | Kreidler, Eva-Maria, Dr. rer. nat. Schönaicher Strasse 220 D-7030 Böblingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 80101924.1 | 10.04.1980 | [1980/23] | Priority number, date | DE19792917455 | 30.04.1979 Original published format: DE 2917455 | [1980/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0018520 | Date: | 12.11.1980 | Language: | DE | [1980/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0018520 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/322, H01L21/265 | [1980/23] | CPC: |
H01L21/26513 (EP,US);
H01L21/3221 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1980/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur vollständigen Ausheilung von Gitterdefekten in durch Ionenimplantation von Phosphor erzeugten N-leitenden Zonen einer Siliciumhalbleitervorrichtung und zugehörige Siliciumhalbleitervorrichtung | [1980/23] | English: | Elimination process of crystal defects produced in N-type layers of a silicon semiconductor device by phosphorus ion implantation and device produced by this method | [1980/23] | French: | Procédé d'élimination des défauts de réseau causés par l'implantation d'ions de phosphore dans des couches de type N de dispositifs semiconducteurs au silicium et dispositif obtenu | [1980/23] | Examination procedure | 16.01.1981 | Examination requested [1981/13] | 15.10.1981 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.11.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP53108379 [ ]; | JP53089366 [ ]; | [A]US3852119 (GOSNEY W, et al); | [A]FR2356277 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | US4118250 [ ] (HORNG CHENG TZONG, et al); | US4135292 [ ] (JAFFE JAMES M, et al); | [A]US4144100 (MACIVER BERNARD A, et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 2, NR. 141, 22. November 1978, Tokyo, JP & JP-A-53 108 379 * Seite 8805 E 78 *, & JP53108379 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 2, Nr. 124, 18. Oktober 1978, Tokyo, JP & JP-A-53 089366 * Seite 7230 e 78 *, & JP53089366 A 00000000 | [ ] - NEUES AUS DER TECHNIK, Jahrgang 1978, Nr. 3, 15. Juni 1978, Wurzburg, DE, "Herstellung bipolarer integrierter Schaltungen ohne Epitaxie", Zusammenfassung Nr. 465 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 19, Nr. 11, April 1977, New York, US, J. B. DINKLAGE et al.: "Gettering by ion implantation", Seite 4091 | [P] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTRO CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Band 126, August 1979, New York, US, A. SCHMITT et al.: "Damage anneal of phosphorous/antimony double implants in silicon", Seite 367C * Zusammenfassung Nr. 558 * |