Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5841295B | 10.09.1983 | B2 | JPS55137158 | 25.10.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4461679 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5841296B | 10.09.1983 | B2 | JPS55137159 | 25.10.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4461779 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS55137160 | 25.10.1980 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4461879 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS5693754 | 29.07.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | JP17033879 | 28.12.1979 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4363890 | 14.12.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4461779 | 12.04.1979 | JP4461879 | 12.04.1979 | JP17033879 | 28.12.1979 | JP4461679 | 12.04.1979 | US24057681 | 09.03.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0017925 | Global Dossier | 07.03.1984 | B1 | EP0017925 | 29.10.1980 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP4461779 | 12.04.1979 | JP4461879 | 12.04.1979 | JP17033879 | 28.12.1979 | JP4461679 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3066797D1 | 12.04.1984 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP4461779 | 12.04.1979 | JP4461879 | 12.04.1979 | JP17033879 | 28.12.1979 | JP4461679 | 12.04.1979 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4321189 | 23.03.1982 | A | Priority number | Date | JP4461779 | 12.04.1979 | JP4461879 | 12.04.1979 | JP17033879 | 28.12.1979 | JP4461679 | 12.04.1979 |