EP0017925 - Flame retardant polyamide molding resin and process for its preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.01.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohshita, Hiroshi 70, Yomegajaya Narumi-cho Midori-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Tsutsumi, Tadao 1-82 Ikegamidai Midori-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken / JP | [1980/22] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1980/22] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 80101940.7 | 10.04.1980 | [1980/22] | Priority number, date | JP19790044616 | 12.04.1979 Original published format: JP 4461679 | JP19790044617 | 12.04.1979 Original published format: JP 4461779 | JP19790044618 | 12.04.1979 Original published format: JP 4461879 | JP19790170338 | 28.12.1979 Original published format: JP 17033879 | [1980/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0017925 | Date: | 29.10.1980 | Language: | EN | [1980/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0017925 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00, C08K5/34 | [1980/22] | CPC: |
C08K5/34928 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/34928, C08L77/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1980/22] | Title | German: | Flammwidriges Polyamid-Pressharz und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1980/22] | English: | Flame retardant polyamide molding resin and process for its preparation | [1980/22] | French: | Résine de moulage polyamide résistant à la flamme et procédé pour sa préparation | [1980/22] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1981 | Examination requested [1981/25] | 14.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.10.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 07.03.1984 | IT | 07.03.1984 | NL | 07.03.1984 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 07.03.1984 | |
NL | 07.03.1984 | ||
Former [1985/23] | NL | 07.03.1984 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP53088854 ; | US4001177 [ ] (TSUTSUMI TADAO, et al); | DE2740092 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) | [A] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 89, 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA, A. YANAGIMOTO et al. "Fire-resistant resin compositions", page 46, column 2, abstract no. 198596c, & JP - A - 53 -088854., & JP53088854 A 00000000 |