Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3121870 | 23.12.1982 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3003331 | 30.01.1980 | DE3121870 | 02.06.1981 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0033474 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1981 | A3 | EP0033474 | 12.08.1981 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3003331 | 30.01.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3003331 | 06.08.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3003331 | 30.01.1980 |