EP0033474 - Coupling device between a diode emitting IR and a single glass-fibre used as a light wave guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.06.1983 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Plihal, Manfred, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Sonnenspitzstrasse 13a D-8000 München 82 / DE | 02 /
Goerne, Jan, Dipl.-Ing. Heinrich-Vogl-Strasse 8 D-8000 München 71 / DE | [1981/32] | Application number, filing date | 81100400.1 | 20.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | DE19803003331 | 30.01.1980 Original published format: DE 3003331 | [1981/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033474 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033474 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/00, G02B7/26 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/4292 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L33/483 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kopplung einer Infrarotdiode mit einer als Lichtwellenleiter verwendeten Einzelglasfaser | [1981/32] | English: | Coupling device between a diode emitting IR and a single glass-fibre used as a light wave guide | [1981/32] | French: | Dispositif de couplage d'une diode luminescente infrarouge avec comme guide de lumière une fibre de verre unique | [1981/32] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 26.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 08.04.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1983/31] | 21.04.1983 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1983/31] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [D]DE2922949 | [ ] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, Nr. 179, Marz 1979, Seite 108, Nr. 17910 Havant-HantsG.B. "Connection of a photo-electric component and a light pipe". |