EP0040730 - Elastomeric thermoplastic moulding compositions of grafted polybutadienes and polyamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.1985 [1985/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/48] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grigo, Ulrich, Dr. Michelsheide 9 D-4152 Kempen 3 / DE | 02 /
Fahnler, Friedrich, Ing. Wimmersweg 60 D-4150 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Lindner, Christian, Dr. Riehler Strasse 200 D-5000 Köln / DE | 04 /
Binsack, Rudolf, Dr. Bethelstrasse 4a D-4150 Krefeld / DE | [1981/48] | Application number, filing date | 81103502.1 | 08.05.1981 | [1981/48] | Priority number, date | DE19803019233 | 20.05.1980 Original published format: DE 3019233 | [1981/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0040730 | Date: | 02.12.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0040730 | Date: | 31.10.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08L51/04, C08L77/00 | [1981/48] | CPC: |
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/04, C08L2666/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1981/48] | Title | German: | Elastomere thermoplastische Formmassen aus Polybutadienpfropfpolymerisaten und Polyamiden | [1981/48] | English: | Elastomeric thermoplastic moulding compositions of grafted polybutadienes and polyamides | [1981/48] | French: | Masses à mouler élastomères thermoplastiques à base de polybutadiènes greffés et de polyamides | [1981/48] | Examination procedure | 08.05.1981 | Examination requested [1981/48] | 06.10.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 26.04.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4173556 [ ] (CORAN AUBERT Y [US], et al); | EP0001245 [ ] (BAYER AG [DE]); | DE1273184 [ ] |