EP0043556 - Pinch bottom valve bag [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states St. Regis Paper Company 150 East 42nd Street New York N.Y. 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | For all designated states St. Regis Paper Company 150 East 42nd Street New York N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newton, Donald O. 6071 Biscayne Court Pensacola Florida 32504 / US | 02 /
Wilharm, Fred B. Route 5, Box 95-R Cantonment Florida 32533 / US | [1982/02] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/02] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 81105120.0 | 02.07.1981 | [1982/02] | Priority number, date | US19800166171 | 07.07.1980 Original published format: US 166171 | [1982/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0043556 | Date: | 13.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B65D30/26 | [1982/02] | CPC: |
B65D31/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1982/02] | Title | German: | Ventilsack mit einem flachen, in sich umgeschlagenen Bodenabschluss | [1982/02] | English: | Pinch bottom valve bag | [1982/02] | French: | Sac à valve comportant une extrémité fermée par repli sur elle-même | [1982/02] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 03.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/37] | 25.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/25] | 09.01.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR808721 [ ] (PAPETERIES AUBRY SOC D); | US2635803 [ ] (HARTMAN CARL H); | US3065899 [ ] (MEANS JOHN W, et al); | FR81829E [ ]; | US3776451 [ ] (WAXLAX C, et al); | US4069964 [ ] (WILLET GEORGE L, et al) |