Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
26.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1987 [1987/12] |
24.01.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.03.1986 [1986/11] |
27.07.1982 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.09.1982 [1982/39] |
20.11.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.01.1982 [1982/03] |