EP0044059 - Process for the dyeing in a gel state of fibrous articles of wet-spun acrylonitrile polymers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1987 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.03.1987 [1987/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/03] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hähnke, Manfred, Dr. Behringstrasse 13 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | 02 /
Mohr, Reinhard, Dr. Rohrstrasse 34 D-6050 Offenbach am Main / DE | 03 /
Hohmann, Kurt Am Forsthaus Gravenbruch 55 D-6078 Neu-Isenburg / DE | [1982/03] | Application number, filing date | 81105428.7 | 11.07.1981 | [1982/03] | Priority number, date | DE19803026948 | 16.07.1980 Original published format: DE 3026948 | [1982/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0044059 | Date: | 20.01.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0044059 | Date: | 12.03.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.1981 | Classification | IPC: | D06P3/70, D06P1/41, D06F1/06, D01F6/18, // C09B44/00, C09B69/00, C09B23/16, C09B26/04, C09B57/06 | [1982/03] | CPC: |
D06P3/702 (EP,US);
D06P3/70 (KR);
C09B69/001 (EP,US);
D01F1/06 (EP,US);
D01F6/18 (EP,US);
Y10S8/927 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Färben von Fasergut aus nassgesponnenen Acrylnitril-Polymerisaten im Gelzustand | [1982/03] | English: | Process for the dyeing in a gel state of fibrous articles of wet-spun acrylonitrile polymers | [1982/03] | French: | Procédé de teinture à l'état de gel d'articles fibreux en polymères d'acrylonitrile filés au mouillé | [1982/03] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1982 | Examination requested [1982/39] | 21.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 06.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 11.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 07.12.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/12] | Request for further processing for: | 02.05.1984 | Request for further processing filed | 02.05.1984 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.1984 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR980700 [ ] (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | GB673738 [ ] (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO); | DE1269092 [ ] (PETER AG KONRAD); | DE2063179 [ ]; | FR2072020 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | GB1257652 [ ]; | DE2141987 [ ] (BAYER AG); | DE2459564 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | FR2345553 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | DE2823169 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | DE2822912 [ ] (HOECHST AG); | GB1568767 [ ] (SANDOZ LTD); | EP0015232 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | EP0015872 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | GB2048963 [ ] (ICI LTD); | EP0029136 [ ] (HOECHST AG [DE]) | Examination | DE2241259 | GB2017156 | EP0014678 |