EP0033248 - Magnetic toner and method for developing using same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1987 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/31] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gaudioso, Stephen L. 1077 Everwild View Webster New York / US | [1981/31] | Representative(s) | Weatherald, Keith Baynes, et al Rank Xerox Limited Patent Department 364 Euston Road London NW1 3BL / GB | [1985/16] |
Former [1981/31] | Prior, Nicholas J. European Patent Attorney Rank Xerox Patent Department 338 Euston Road London NW1 3BH / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300371.2 | 28.01.1981 | [1981/31] | Priority number, date | US19800115974 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: US 115974 | US19800115973 | 28.01.1980 Original published format: US 115973 | [1981/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033248 | Date: | 05.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033248 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/10, G03G9/00, G03G19/00 | [1981/31] | CPC: |
G03G9/0833 (EP);
G03G9/0832 (EP);
G03G9/08755 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/31] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Toner und ihn verwendendes Entwicklungsverfahren | [1981/31] | English: | Magnetic toner and method for developing using same | [1981/31] | French: | Toner magnétique et procédé de développement l'utilisant | [1981/31] | Examination procedure | 05.10.1981 | Examination requested [1981/50] | 19.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP84201209.8 / EP0136744 | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | Examination | US3627682 | US3590000 |