Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] |
01.02.1986 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] |
14.02.1985 | Change - representative | published on 17.04.1985 [1985/16] |
31.08.1984 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.10.1984 [1984/44] |
13.10.1981 | Request for examination filed | published on 16.12.1981 [1981/50] |
08.06.1981 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.08.1981 [1981/31] |