Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1156084 | 01.11.1983 | A | Priority number | Date | US15597480 | 03.06.1980 | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0365550B | 14.10.1991 | B2 | JPS59146065 | 21.08.1984 | A | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS56113144 | 05.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4271248 | 02.06.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4288516 | 08.09.1981 | A | Priority number | Date | US11597480 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0136744 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1987 | A3 | EP0136744 | 10.04.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | US11597480 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0033248 | Global Dossier | 19.03.1986 | B1 | EP0033248 | 05.08.1981 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | US11597480 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3174121D1 | 24.04.1986 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US11597380 | 28.01.1980 | US11597480 | 28.01.1980 | Type | Divisional application | EP0136744 |