EP0051441 - Nuclear reactor and fuel assembly therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 01.08.1985 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aoyama, Motoo 12-1 Ayukawacho-6-chome Hitachi-shi / JP | 02 /
Kurihara, Kunitoshi 953-1 Takeda Katsuta-shi / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Renzo 161 Ishinazakacho Hitachi-shi / JP | [1982/19] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/19] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 81305098.6 | 28.10.1981 | [1982/19] | Priority number, date | JP19800150730 | 29.10.1980 Original published format: JP 15073080 | [1982/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0051441 | Date: | 12.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32 | [1982/19] | CPC: |
G21C3/328 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, SE [1982/32] |
Former [1982/19] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kernreaktor und Brennelementbündel dafür | [1982/19] | English: | Nuclear reactor and fuel assembly therefor | [1982/19] | French: | Réacteur nucléaire et assemblage d'éléments combustibles | [1982/19] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1991 | Examination procedure | 03.03.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL | 14.05.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.06.1982 | Examination requested [1982/36] | 28.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1985/40] | 25.04.1985 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.11.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 30.11.1981 | NL   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3105026 [ ] (DICKSON JAMES J); | US3227621 [ ] (ALLAN HARGO BERNT TORSTEN, et al); | FR1285565 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | US3158549 [ ] (FOWLER WAYNE D); | DE1141033 [ ] (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK); | US3749640 [ ] (ISRAEL S) |