Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
16.09.1983 | Withdrawal of application | published on 16.11.1983 [1983/46] |
01.07.1983 | Change - designated states | published on 31.08.1983 [1983/35] |
05.05.1983 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.07.1983 [1983/27] |
05.05.1983 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.07.1983 [1983/27] |