EP0082907 - Coupling-system for operating the heald frames in a loom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.1983 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1983/27] | For all designated states GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zürcherstrasse 9 CH-8401 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hintsch, Otto, Dr. Grundackerstrasse 5 CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH | [1983/27] | Application number, filing date | 81810518.1 | 28.12.1981 | [1983/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0082907 | Date: | 06.07.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | D03C1/00 | [1983/27] | CPC: |
D03C1/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1983/35] |
Former [1983/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Kupplungsanordnung zum Steuern der Schäfte einer Webmaschine | [1983/27] | English: | Coupling-system for operating the heald frames in a loom | [1983/27] | French: | Dispositif d'accouplement pour la commande des cadres d'un métier à tisser | [1983/27] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 30.12.1981 | Examination requested [1983/27] | 24.03.1983 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, GB, LU, NL, SE | 03.06.1983 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.08.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 28.12.1982 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 28.12.1982 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH543127 ; | [A]CH473251 ; | [A]DE2412958 ; | [L]EP0047791 ; | [A]DE2741200 |